Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 939 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 6283 Week
» 7173 Month
» 315154 Year
» 1199535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1863 m/e 06/1903
LNER (1924) 8863 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7733 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2534 m/e 12/1946
BR 62534 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D14
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D1406/1903
Claud Hamilton01/1921
D16/304/1935
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L55
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Tue 11/11/1958 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/04/1951
31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 24/08/1957
   Withdrawn 11/11/1958
31A Cambridge 5w/e 15/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1921 Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted
01/1921 Saturated Diagram 27 boiler fitted
06/1926 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
06/1926 Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted
04/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1933 Extended Smokebox fitted
04/1935 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
04/1935 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as GER Number 1863
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
01/1921 Modification Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted    
01/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated Diagram 27 boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8863    
06/1926 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
06/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted    
04/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1933 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
04/1935 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
04/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7733 but not taken up    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2534    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62534    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62534 from Cambridge (31A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev