Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2733 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16139 Week
» 69155 Month
» 188682 Year
» 3215535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1864 |
m/e |
06/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8864 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7734 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2535 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62535 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L55 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/11/1957 off Lincoln (40A) |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1923 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
05/1923 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
05/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1932 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
05/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
10/1936 |
9 ½" Piston Valves fitted |
10/1936 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
10/1936 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
10/1936 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1864 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1923 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8864 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7734 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2535 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62535 |
|
|
19/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
25/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62535 from Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
01/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|