Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1864 m/e 06/1903
LNER (1924) 8864 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7734 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2535 m/e 10/1946
BR 62535 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D14
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D1406/1903
Claud Hamilton05/1923
D16/310/1936
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L55
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1957 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 01/1958
Service Life 54 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
40A Lincoln 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 25/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1923 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
05/1923 Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted
05/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1932 Extended Smokebox fitted
05/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
10/1936 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted
10/1936 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
10/1936 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
10/1936 Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as GER Number 1864
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
05/1923 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
05/1923 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8864    
05/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1932 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
05/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
10/1936 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
10/1936 Modification Modification: 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted    
10/1936 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed    
10/1936 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7734 but not taken up    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2535    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62535    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62535 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev