Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4161 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17567 Week
» 70583 Month
» 190110 Year
» 3216963 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1850 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8850 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7720 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2541 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62541 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D56 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/10/1955 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
5w/e |
27/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1921 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
11/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
06/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
07/1939 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1939 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1850 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8850 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
07/1939 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7720 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2541 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62541 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
17/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62541 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|