Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1850 m/e 12/1903
LNER (1924) 8850 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7720 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2541 m/e 06/1946
BR 62541 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton12/1903
D16/307/1939
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D56
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal Mon 17/10/1955 off Cambridge (31A)
Service Life 51 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 22/03/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/03/1954
   Withdrawn 17/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1921 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
11/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1932 Extended Smokebox fitted
06/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
07/1939 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
07/1939 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as GER Number 1850
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
02/1921 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8850    
11/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1932 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
07/1939 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
07/1939 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7720 but not taken up    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2541    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62541    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62541 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev