|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1957 | Bury St. Edmunds | No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. | SLS/195709 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1852 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
07/1922 | Modification | Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8852 | ||
06/1927 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
02/1928 | Modification | Diagram 26 boiler fitted | ||
02/1928 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7722 but not taken up | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2543 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62543 | ||
02/1949 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted | ||
02/1949 | Modification | Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding | ||
02/1949 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
23/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
14/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
13/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62543 from March (31B) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |