Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 204 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2543 Week
» 8677 Month
» 236561 Year
» 1458126 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1854 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 8854 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7724 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2545 m/e 08/1946
BR 62545 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton01/1904
D16/303/1933
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D56
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal Mon 22/09/1958 off Kings Lynn (31C)
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1904
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 19/07/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/09/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/06/1953
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/03/1954
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 19/03/1955
31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn 22/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC MEL   w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   22/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1916 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
05/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1933 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
03/1933 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1854
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
06/1916 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8854    
05/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1933 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
03/1933 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7724 but not taken up    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2545    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62545    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
22/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62545 from Kings Lynn (31C)    

prev prev