Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1840 m/e 11/1906
LNER (1924) 8840 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7710 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2551 m/e 06/1946
BR 62551 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton11/1906
D16/303/1935
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G61
To Service During 11/1906
Withdrawal Mon 16/07/1956 off Spital Bridge (35C)
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 17/05/1952
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 23/01/1954
   Withdrawn 16/07/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1923 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
02/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
02/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1935 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
03/1935 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1906 To Service To service as GER Number 1840
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
08/1923 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8840    
02/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
02/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1935 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
03/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7710 but not taken up    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2551    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62551    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
07/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 62551 from Spital Bridge (35C)    

prev prev