Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1334 Today
» 1394 Yesterday
» 6501 Week
» 6501 Month
» 195636 Year
» 1417201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1842 m/e 11/1906
LNER (1924) 8842 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7712 m/e 12/1942
LNER (1946) 2553 m/e 23/03/1946
BR 62553 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton11/1906
D16/209/1930
D16/309/1949
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G61
To Service During 11/1906
Withdrawal Tue 01/01/1957 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 03/1957
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1906
YAR Yarmouth South Town 01/01/1948
NOR Norwich Thorpe m/e 07/1949
31A Cambridge 5w/e 22/10/1955
   Withdrawn 01/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town 14/09/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 07/05/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   01/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1930 Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
09/1930 Extended Smokebox fitted
09/1949 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
09/1949 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
09/1949 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1906 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1842
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8842    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1930 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
09/1930 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
12/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7712    
23/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2553    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62553    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
09/1949 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
09/1949 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
09/1949 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62553 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev