Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 684 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14090 Week
» 67106 Month
» 186633 Year
» 3213486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1844 |
m/e |
11/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8844 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7714 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2555 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62555 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G61 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/03/1958 off Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1914 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
10/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
07/1935 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
03/1939 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1939 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1844 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8844 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
07/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
03/1939 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7714 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2555 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62555 |
|
|
24/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62555 from Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|