Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1846 m/e 12/1906
LNER (1924) 8846 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7716 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2557 m/e 12/1946
BR 62557 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton12/1906
D16/203/1934
D16/304/1944
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G61
To Service During 12/1906
Withdrawal Mon 31/10/1955 off Cambridge (31A)
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 16/02/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 31/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1924 Diagram 26 boiler fitted
02/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1934 Extended Smokebox fitted
04/1944 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding
04/1944 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
04/1944 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1906 To Service To service as GER Number 1846
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8846    
12/1924 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
02/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1934 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7716 but not taken up    
04/1944 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
04/1944 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
04/1944 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2557    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62557    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62557 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev