Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1833 |
m/e |
04/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8833 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7703 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2564 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62564 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/03/1958 off Lincoln (40A) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1930 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
01/1930 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
01/1948 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
01/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1948 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1833 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8833 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7703 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2564 |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
01/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62564 |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
24/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62564 from Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|