Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1833 m/e 04/1908
LNER (1924) 8833 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7703 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2564 m/e 10/1946
BR 62564 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton04/1908
D16/201/1930
D16/301/1948
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A64
To Service During 04/1908
Withdrawal Mon 24/03/1958 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 04/1958
Service Life 49 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/09/1952
32G Melton Constable 5w/e 24/04/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/07/1954
32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 22/01/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 23/04/1955
32D Yarmouth South Town 3w/e 12/11/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/01/1956
31A Cambridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
40A Lincoln 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 24/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1926 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1930 Diagram 26 boiler fitted
01/1930 Extended Smokebox fitted
01/1948 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding
01/1948 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
01/1948 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1908 To Service To service as GER Number 1833
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8833    
03/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1930 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
01/1930 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7703 but not taken up    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2564    
01/1948 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
01/1948 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
01/1948 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62564    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62564 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev