Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1834 |
m/e |
04/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8834 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7704 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2565 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62565 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 off Kings Lynn (31C) |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
07/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
03/1929 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
06/1945 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
06/1945 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1945 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1834 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8834 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7704 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2565 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62565 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62565 from Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|