Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1837 m/e 06/1908
LNER (1924) 8837 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7707 m/e 11/1942
LNER (1946) 2568 m/e 04/1946
BR 62568 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton06/1908
D16/305/1933
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A64
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal Mon 28/04/1958 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 49 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/06/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/07/1952
31D South Lynn 4w/e 18/10/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
40A Lincoln 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 28/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
07/1931 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
07/1931 Extended Smokebox fitted
05/1933 8" Piston Valves fitted
05/1933 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
05/1933 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
05/1933 Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as GER Number 1837
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8837    
10/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1931 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
07/1931 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
05/1933 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
05/1933 Modification Modification: 8" Piston Valves fitted    
05/1933 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed    
05/1933 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
11/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7707    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2568    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62568    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62568 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev