Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1821 m/e 06/1909
LNER (1924) 8821 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7691 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2572 m/e 11/1946
BR 62572 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton06/1909
D16/305/1933
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B66
To Service During 06/1909
Withdrawal Mon 28/07/1958 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E Colchester 3w/e 31/05/1950
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/12/1950
31A Cambridge 5w/e 23/06/1951
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/07/1951
31B March 5w/e 22/09/1951
   Withdrawn 28/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1920 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
02/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
05/1933 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
05/1933 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1909 To Service To service as GER Number 1821
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
05/1920 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8821    
02/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1933 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
05/1933 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7691 but not taken up    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2572    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62572    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/08/1954 Sightings Stratford Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62572 from March (31B)    

prev prev