Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1825 m/e 11/1909
LNER (1924) 8825 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7695 m/e 12/1942
LNER (1946) 2576 m/e 04/1946
BR 62576 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton11/1909
D16/303/1937
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B66
To Service During 11/1909
Withdrawal w/e Mon 09/09/1957 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 10/1957
Service Life 47 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/06/1953
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/03/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 09/09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1922 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
05/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1928 Extended Smokebox fitted
06/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
03/1937 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
03/1937 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
03/1937 Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed
03/1937 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1909 To Service To service as GER Number 1825
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
05/1922 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8825    
05/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1928 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
03/1937 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
03/1937 Modification Modification: 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted    
03/1937 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed    
03/1937 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
12/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7695    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2576    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62576    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62576 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev