Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 23 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6557 Week
» 6557 Month
» 195692 Year
» 1417257 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1829 m/e 12/1909
LNER (1924) 8829 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7699 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2580 m/e 12/1946
BR 62580 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton12/1909
D16/202/1930
D16/304/1948
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B66
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal Mon 09/06/1958 off Kings Lynn (31C)
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 48 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1909
YAR Yarmouth South Town 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn 09/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   09/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1930 Extended Smokebox fitted
02/1930 Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
04/1948 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
04/1948 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
04/1948 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1829
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8829    
02/1930 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
02/1930 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7699 but not taken up    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2580    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
04/1948 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
04/1948 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
04/1948 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62580    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
09/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62580 from Kings Lynn (31C)    

prev prev