Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1813 m/e 04/1910
LNER (1924) 8813 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7683 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2584 m/e 09/1946
BR 62584 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton04/1910
D16/204/1926
D16/309/1947
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D67
To Service During 04/1910
Withdrawal Mon 23/12/1957 off Kings Lynn (31C)
Scrapping During 02/1958
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge m/e 21/07/1956
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 19/01/1957
   Withdrawn 23/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1914 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
04/1926 Diagram 26 boiler fitted
04/1926 Extended Smokebox fitted
08/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1947 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding
09/1947 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
09/1947 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1910 To Service To service as GER Number 1813
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
07/1914 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8813    
04/1926 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
04/1926 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
08/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7683 but not taken up    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2584    
09/1947 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
09/1947 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
09/1947 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62584    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62584 from Kings Lynn (31C)    

prev prev