Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1814 |
m/e |
04/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8814 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7684 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2585 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62585 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D67 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/04/1955 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
45 yrs , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1921 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
06/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1931 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
02/1935 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
02/1935 |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1814 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8814 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
02/1935 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7684 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2585 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62585 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
11/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62585 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
05/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|