Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 125 Today
» 1336 Yesterday
» 3898 Week
» 3898 Month
» 193033 Year
» 1414598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1814 m/e 04/1910
LNER (1924) 8814 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7684 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2585 m/e 09/1946
BR 62585 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton04/1910
D16/302/1935
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D67
To Service During 04/1910
Withdrawal Mon 11/04/1955 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 05/1955
Service Life 45 yrs , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1910
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/07/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn 11/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1921 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
06/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1931 Extended Smokebox fitted
02/1935 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
02/1935 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1910 To Service To service as GER Number 1814
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
01/1921 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8814    
06/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1931 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
02/1935 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
02/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7684 but not taken up    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2585    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62585    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62585 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev