Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 6 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2867 Week
» 21649 Month
» 269942 Year
» 1154323 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1816 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 8816 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7686 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2587 m/e 09/1946
BR 62587 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton06/1910
D16/303/1934
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D67
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1956 off Grantham (35B)
Service Life 46 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 31/05/1950
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 2w/e 17/06/1950
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn 17/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1920 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
05/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
03/1934 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
03/1934 Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed
03/1934 8" Piston Valves fitted
03/1934 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as GER Number 1816
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
05/1920 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8816    
05/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
03/1934 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
03/1934 Modification Modification: 8" Piston Valves fitted    
03/1934 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed    
03/1934 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7686 but not taken up    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2587    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62587    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 62587 from Grantham (35B)    

prev prev