Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1801 m/e 07/1910
LNER (1924) 8801 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7671 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2592 m/e 09/1946
BR 62592 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton07/1910
D16/204/1929
D16/306/1945
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P67
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal Tue 01/04/1958 off Kings Lynn (31C)
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YB Yarmouth Beach 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/09/1952
32G Melton Constable 4w/e 25/07/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/09/1953
32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 19/03/1955
32G Melton Constable 5w/e 23/04/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe 3w/e 14/05/1955
31A Cambridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 01/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
04/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
04/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1929 Diagram 26 boiler fitted
06/1945 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding
06/1945 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
06/1945 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as GER Number 1801
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
06/1919 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8801    
04/1929 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
04/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
04/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7671 but not taken up    
06/1945 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
06/1945 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
06/1945 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2592    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62592    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
19/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62592 from Kings Lynn (31C)    

prev prev