Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 524 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 21213 Month
» 269506 Year
» 1153887 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1808 m/e 10/1910
LNER (1924) 8808 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7678 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2599 m/e 08/1946
BR 62599 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton10/1910
D16/306/1937
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P67
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Mon 15/09/1958 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 01/1959
Service Life 47 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91M To London Midland Region m/e 06/05/1950
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/06/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/07/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
40A Lincoln 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 15/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
07/1929 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted
07/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
06/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
06/1937 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted
06/1937 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
06/1937 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
06/1937 Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as GER Number 1808
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8808    
11/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1929 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
07/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
06/1937 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
06/1937 Modification Modification: 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted    
06/1937 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed    
06/1937 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7678 but not taken up    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2599    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62599    
06/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62599 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev