Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1794 m/e 05/1911
LNER (1924) 8794 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7664 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2605 m/e 10/1946
BR 62605 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton05/1911
D16/202/1929
D16/303/1940
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number E69
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal Thu 06/06/1957 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 08/1957
Service Life 46 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 5w/e 17/12/1955
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
   Withdrawn 06/06/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1925 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
02/1929 Diagram 26 boiler fitted
03/1940 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
03/1940 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
03/1940 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as GER Number 1794
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8794    
02/1925 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1929 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
02/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
03/1940 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
03/1940 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
03/1940 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7664 but not taken up    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2605    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62605    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
06/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62605 from March (31B)    

prev prev