Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 224 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1323 Week
» 7457 Month
» 235341 Year
» 1456906 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1796 m/e 07/1911
LNER (1924) 8796 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7666 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2607 m/e 12/1946
BR 62607 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton07/1911
D16/212/1928
D16/312/1946
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number E69
To Service During 07/1911
Withdrawal Mon 28/11/1955 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 12/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1911
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
BSE Bury St Edmunds m/e 07/1949
31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/11/1954
   Withdrawn 28/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 04/12/1954
WDN   28/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1925 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
06/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1928 Extended Smokebox fitted
12/1928 Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
12/1946 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
12/1946 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
12/1946 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1796
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8796    
04/1925 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
06/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1928 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7666 but not taken up    
12/1946 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
12/1946 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
12/1946 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2607    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62607    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (BSE)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
28/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62607 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev