Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 162 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2069 Week
» 20851 Month
» 269144 Year
» 1153525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1798 m/e 08/1911
LNER (1924) 8798 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7668 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2609 m/e 09/1946
BR 62609 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton08/1911
D16/304/1934
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number E69
To Service During 08/1911
Withdrawal Mon 04/02/1957 off Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)
Scrapping During 02/1957
Service Life 45 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
COL Colchester 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 31/05/1950
9F Heaton Mersey 2w/e 17/06/1950
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 17/07/1951
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
31D South Lynn 4w/e 19/07/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/09/1953
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 19/12/1953
   Withdrawn 04/02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1932 GNR style Chimney fitted
04/1932 Extended Smokebox fitted
04/1934 8" Piston Valves fitted
04/1934 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted
04/1934 Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed
04/1934 Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1911 To Service To service as GER Number 1798
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8798    
06/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1932 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
04/1932 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
04/1934 Modification Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
04/1934 Modification Modification: 8" Piston Valves fitted    
04/1934 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed    
04/1934 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7668 but not taken up    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2609    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62609    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
19/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62609 from Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    

prev prev