Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 5197 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20809 Week
» 119454 Month
» 322118 Year
» 3348971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1782 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8782 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7652 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2613 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62613 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
D16 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H88 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 25/10/1960 off March (31B) |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1931 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
12/1948 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
12/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
12/1948 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/05/1959 |
Peterborough Spital Bridge MPD |
. D16s have been re-transferred to Spital Bridge (former MR shed) and are on passenger turns to Northampton and Leicester-62597 an 62612/3 have been so noted. |
SLS/195907 |
01/02/1960 |
Peterborough Midland Closure |
Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. |
SLS/196003 |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Foundry) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1782 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8782 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7652 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2613 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
12/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62613 |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
25/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62613 from March (31B) |
|
|
12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|