Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 214 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 11785 Month
» 260078 Year
» 1144459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1784 m/e 07/1923
LNER (1924) 8784 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7654 y/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 2615 m/e 11/1946
BR 62615 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class D16
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D16/206/1929
D16/304/1947
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number H88
To Service During 07/1923
Withdrawal Mon 13/10/1958 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BSE Bury St Edmunds 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/04/1951
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31B March 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 13/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
04/1947 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding
04/1947 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted
04/1947 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1923 To Service To service as GER Number 1784
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 26 boiler fitted
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8784    
06/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7654 but not taken up    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2615    
04/1947 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
04/1947 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
04/1947 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62615    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62615 from March (31B)    

prev prev