Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 815 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14221 Week
» 67237 Month
» 186764 Year
» 3213617 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1785 |
m/e |
07/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8785 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7655 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2616 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62616 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
D16 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H88 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/02/1953 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
05/1944 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
05/1944 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1944 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1785 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8785 |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7655 but not taken up |
|
|
05/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
05/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2616 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62616 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62616 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|