Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1786 |
m/e |
08/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8786 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7656 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (Amend) |
8786 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2617 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62617 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
D16 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H88 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/05/1957 off Melton Constable (32G) |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
32G |
Melton Constable |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
01/1945 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
01/1945 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1945 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1786 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8786 |
|
|
06/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
11/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7656 |
|
|
08/1944 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8786 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
01/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2617 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62617 |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
20/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62617 from Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|