Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1627 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19430 Week
» 72446 Month
» 191973 Year
» 3218826 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
642 |
m/e |
09/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9642 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2060 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways (1st) |
62060 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
British Railways (2nd) |
62282 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
D31 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 28/02/1950 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1890 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/02/1950 |
52H |
|
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
25/03/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/10/1948 |
Cowlairs Works |
Class 'D.31' No. 2060 CAR was ex Works during W/E 16/10, having been re-numbered 62060, painted black and lined; a smokebox numberplate had also been fitted. It is interesting to note that No. 62060 is the first of the class to be painted in the latest style, whilst of the other three survivors of this class two have already been re-numbered into British Railways stock -Nos. 62065 KEI and 62072 BGT-leaving only No. 2059 CAR as L.N.E.R. No. 57320 has been repaired at Cowlairs-the first ex L.M.S. engine to be dealt with here-and has appeared with Polmadie on the buffer beam, in true L.N.E.R. style; it is not known whether the former L.M.S. 27A shed plate is still on the smokebox door. |
SLS/194812 |
19/03/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
In the yard on 19/3 were 'B.12' No. 61539, 'D.40' No. 62272, 'D.31' No. 62282 (Condemned, built Cowlairs 1890), 'J.36' No. 65294, 'J.72' No. 68717 and '2F' No. 57260 (built Neilson 1884). |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 642 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9642 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2060 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62060 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62282 |
|
|
28/02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62282 |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|