Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1309 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19112 Week
» 72128 Month
» 191655 Year
» 3218508 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
26 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6826 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2261 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62261 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E827 |
Works Number |
5606 |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1953 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1899 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
on |
10/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 26 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5606 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6826 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2261 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62261 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62261 |
|
|
08/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|