Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1774 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19577 Week
» 72593 Month
» 192120 Year
» 3218973 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
27 |
m/e |
04/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6827 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2265 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62265 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Inverurie Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 04/1909 |
Withdrawal |
During 01/1957 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 9 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1909 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/12/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. |
SLS/194912 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 27 Built at Inverurie Works |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6827 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2265 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62265 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62265 |
|
|