Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 775 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 775 Week
» 18111 Month
» 295907 Year
» 1180288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNSR 49 m/e 10/1920
LNER (1924) 6849 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 2277 m/e 08/1946
BR 62277 w/e 13/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1920 GORDON HIGHLANDER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L730
Works Number 22563
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KIT Kittybrewster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 4w/e 14/07/1951
   Withdrawn 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 2277    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62277    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62277    

prev prev