Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 246   20/02/1928
LNER (1946) 2712   11/1946
BR 62712 w/e 01/04/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/02/1928 MORAYSHIRE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class Shire/Hunt
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 20/02/1928
Withdrawal Mon 03/07/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 15/02/1958
64G Hawick 4w/e 09/04/1960
   Withdrawn 03/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 64G Hawick 4w/e 09/04/1960
WDN   03/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1930 Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 2712    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62712    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
15/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
03/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62712    

prev prev