Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1729 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15135 Week
» 68151 Month
» 187678 Year
» 3214531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
307 |
|
17/03/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2716 |
|
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62716 |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
07/05/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1930 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 307, name: KINCARDINESHIRE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1395 |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2716 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62716 |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
28/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62716 |
|
|
05/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|