Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1084 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14490 Week
» 67506 Month
» 187033 Year
» 3213886 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
235 |
|
02/06/1932 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2740 |
|
04/1946 |
British Railways |
62740 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
02/06/1932 |
THE BEDALE |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/04/1947 |
Woolwich Station |
Woolwich-Palace Gates, etc., Services. Mr. Milburn's article is decidedly interesting. The outer end of the Palace Gates terminal lines and the site of the first connecting link there-from to the G.N. section in 1930 were within view from what was my recording station home for many years. The special trains in connection with Arsenal F.C. matches at Highbury were run to Finsbury Park station, G.N., thence empty to Wood Green and Bounds Green sidings (close to Palace Gates), beginning in the winter of 1921-2 before grouping. The first was hauled by now defunct G.E.R. 2-4-2T No. 235. The excursions using the same N.L. Victoria Park route, were instituted later in L.N.E. days, Ivatt 0-6-0's working through from Hatfield to Southend quite often at first. In view of the frequency and considerable use of the Fenchurch Street-Docks-N. Woolwich through service by which I frequently travelled on business (in one of those four-wheeled firsts next the 6-w. brake van) 15-25 years ago, it seems strange that it is now non-existent, though provided people can get to Stratford L.L. there appears to be still a good service thence to Silvertown and Woolwich N. The G.E. 0-4-4T '1100' class used to work a good deal on the Palace Gates trains with, of course, the ubiquitous 2-4-2T on Stratford workings.-Yours truly, R. A. H. WEIGHT. Hastings, 6th April, 1947. |
SLS/194706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/06/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 235, name: THE BEDALE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1550 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2740 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62740 |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
01/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62740 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|