Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4778 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18821 Week
» 83775 Month
» 286439 Year
» 3313292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
283 |
|
18/08/1933 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2746 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62746 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1954 |
Wetherby Races, Easter Monday |
Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. |
SLS/195406 |
31/01/1956 |
York MPD (ex-L.M.S.. shed) |
December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 283, name: THE MIDDLETON Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1572 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2746 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62746 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
16/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62746 |
|
|
09/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|