Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1050 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18853 Week
» 71869 Month
» 191396 Year
» 3218249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
362 |
|
11/10/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2765 |
|
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62765 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SBK |
Starbeck |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 362, name: THE GOATHLAND Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1596 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2765 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62765 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
16/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62765 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|