Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 427 m/e 04/1891
LNER (1924) 7427 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7797 m/e 01/1943
LNER (1946) 2780 m/e 01/1947
BR 62780 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E404/1891
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number Y26
To Service During 04/1891
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1955
Service Life 64 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1951
   Withdrawn 26/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge w/e 29/09/1951
WDN   26/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1891 To Service To service as GER Number 427
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7427    
01/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 7797    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 2780    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62780    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
26/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62780    

prev prev