Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3124 Week
» 14695 Month
» 262988 Year
» 1147369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1942) 7798   Not applied
GER 463 m/e 11/1892
LNER (1924) 7463 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 2781 m/e 10/1946
BR 62781 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E411/1892
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A31
To Service During 11/1892
Withdrawal Mon 02/01/1956
Service Life 63 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
CAM Cambridge m/e 30/11/1949
   Withdrawn 02/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 17/12/1949
WDN   02/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 7798 but not taken up    
11/1892 To Service To service as GER Number 463
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7463    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2781    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62781    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 62781    

prev prev