Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14194 Week
» 67210 Month
» 186737 Year
» 3213590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7799 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
466 |
m/e |
12/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7466 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2782 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62782 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A31 |
To Service |
During 12/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 29/11/1954 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1892 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/11/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
on |
16/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
23/01/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/11/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) |
March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. |
SLS/194302 |
30/11/1954 |
Unusual withdrawals |
At the end of November two engines of more than usual interest appeared among the withdrawals. No. 62782, built at Stratford in 1892 as No. 466, was one of the Holden G.E. 'Intermediates,' a class which originally totalled 100 engines. Fifty were withdrawn by the end of 1931, thirty more between 1933 and 1938, No. 7502 in 1939 and No. 7485 in 1940, leaving 18 in service, which figure has been unchanged until now. The other withdrawal of note is No. 68757, the oldest surviving. Stirling saddletank, built at Doncaster in 1892, as No. 922; Nos. 921-930 were the last ones built with 17½' cylinders, three of which still remain on the register. |
SLS/195501 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7799 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 466 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7466 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2782 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62782 |
|
|
29/11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62782 |
|
|