Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 194 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2533 Week
» 8667 Month
» 236551 Year
» 1458116 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1942) 7801   Not applied
GER 478 m/e 10/1894
LNER (1924) 7478 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 2784 m/e 11/1946
BR 62784 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E410/1894
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number I34
To Service During 10/1894
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/05/1955
Scrapping During 08/1955
Service Life 60 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1894
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 30/05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BNS   w/e 26/10/1946
WDN   w/e 30/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 7801 but not taken up    
10/1894 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 478
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7478    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2784    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62784    
30/05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62784    

prev prev