Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 490 m/e 01/1895
LNER (1924) 7490 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7802 m/e 11/1942
LNER (1946) 2785 m/e 12/1946
BR 62785 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E401/1895
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number X34
To Service During 01/1895
Withdrawal Mon 07/12/1959
Service Life 64 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BSE Bury St Edmunds 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34D Hitchin (GNR) 6w/e 25/12/1954
31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn 07/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   07/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1931 Vacuum Ejector fitted

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1895 To Service To service as GER Number 490
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7490    
04/1931 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7802    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2785    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 62785    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 62785    

prev prev