Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 69898 Month
» 189425 Year
» 3216278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
490 |
m/e |
01/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7490 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7802 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2785 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62785 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X34 |
To Service |
During 01/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/12/1959 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1931 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1949 |
Cambridge MPD |
On 10/7, the following were in store at Cambridge, in the goods yard behind the shed: 'C.12' No. 7354; 'E.4' No. 2785; 'F.3' No. 7124; 'F.4' Nos. 7160 an 7187. Four other 'E.4's' were in traffic, or on the shed, viz: Nos. 2783, 62788/91 an 2794. |
SLS/194908 |
31/01/1958 |
Locomotive Statement |
4056 was the last ' Star' in service: 30738 remains the sole survivor of the 30736-55. series: 32331 was the last of the rebuilt 'Remembrance' N15IX class. Renewed scrapping of the GW. 90XX class has taken place: the NE. D20 class is now extinct: the, wholesale withdrawal of the D49 class appears to have begun. The V4 class is now extinct. Three G.E. ' Intermediates' (62785/8/97) are all that remain of this wheel-type. 52510 was the last Furness locomotive: 30688 was the first of its class to be scrapped, following an accident at Staines. The A7 class is now extinct: the first two A8 have been withdrawn. 47994 is the sole Garratt survivor. The GW. 31XX class is now reduced to five. All the remaining Rhymney and Taff. Vale engines have now gone: the LBSC E6 class is no longer intact: the first two NB N15 have been withdrawn: 30757 was the last representative of the PD & SWJR. Withdrawals of the GW 67XX, 77XX and 87XX have begun; the 54XX are rapidly disappearing: only two N.L. engines (58850/7) remain. The M.R. representatives now number four only. 30588 was the last of its class: 68126 was the last GE Y4 in capital stock. D-E. Standard shunters continue to be built very rapidly, Crewe and Doncaster having joined Derby and Darlington in their production. Further new classes of main line locomotives have appeared and several more are due for delivery early in 1958. D-M. Swindon has now joined the various contractors in turning out the standard small shunting type. These locos. will in future (with the exception of d11176) bear numbers in the D.2XXX series. |
SLS/195803 |
07/04/1958 |
Cambridge MPD |
With the withdrawal of 62788/97 in March, only one E4 remains-62785 and it was noted on the Mildenhall branch on 7th April. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 490 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7490 |
|
|
04/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7802 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2785 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62785 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
07/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62785 |
|
|