Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15981 Week
» 68997 Month
» 188524 Year
» 3215377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7803 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
492 |
m/e |
01/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7492 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2786 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62786 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X34 |
To Service |
During 01/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 30/07/1956 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/07/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) |
March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. |
SLS/194302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7803 but not taken up |
|
|
01/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 492 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7492 |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2786 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62786 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
30/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62786 |
|
|