Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 496 m/e 01/1895
LNER (1924) 7496 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7805 m/e 10/1942
LNER (1946) 2788 m/e 01/1947
BR 62788 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E401/1895
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number X34
To Service During 01/1895
Withdrawal Tue 04/03/1958
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 63 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/10/1951
31A Cambridge m/e 21/07/1956
   Withdrawn 04/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/07/1956
WDN   04/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1895 To Service To service as GER Number 496
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7496    
10/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7805    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 2788    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62788    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62788    

prev prev