Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1942) 7806   Not applied
GER 497 m/e 07/1896
LNER (1924) 7497 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 2789 m/e 03/1946
BR 62789 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E407/1896
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L37
To Service During 07/1896
Withdrawal Mon 02/12/1957
Scrapping During 01/1958
Service Life 61 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 25/08/1956
   Withdrawn 02/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town 09/03/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/08/1956
WDN   02/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 7806 but not taken up    
07/1896 To Service To service as GER Number 497
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7497    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2789    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62789    
25/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62789    

prev prev