Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3125 Week
» 14696 Month
» 262989 Year
» 1147370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1942) 7807   Not applied
GER 503 m/e 09/1896
LNER (1924) 7503 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 2790 m/e 09/1946
BR 62790 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E409/1896
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L37
To Service During 09/1896
Withdrawal Mon 02/01/1956
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 25/11/1950
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
   Withdrawn 02/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   02/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 7807 but not taken up    
09/1896 To Service To service as GER Number 503
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7503    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2790    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62790    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 62790    

prev prev